THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:37:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DARI, PUSHTO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107-121 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-779-0669
Fax: 613-779-0948

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Feb 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H.Azizy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Azizy (CPSO#: 111750 )

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Azizy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DARI, PUSHTO
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107-121 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-779-0669
Fax: 613-779-0948

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Feb 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H.Azizy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Azizy (CPSO#: 111750 )

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Azizy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOGAY AZIZY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOGAY AZIZY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2017