THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:44:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Faculdade de Medicina de Catanduva, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 17 May 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 06 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Werlang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Samaan Werlang (CPSO#: 111752 )
Business Address: 2090 Alta Vista Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7L5
Business Address: 1983 Featherston Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 6P7
6478771035

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Faculdade de Medicina de Catanduva, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 17 May 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 06 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Werlang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Samaan Werlang (CPSO#: 111752 )
Business Address: 2090 Alta Vista Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7L5
Business Address: 1983 Featherston Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 6P7
6478771035

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
05 Feb 2024
16 May 2028
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 05 2024
EXPIRY DATE: May 16 2028
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ANA CAROLINA SAMAAN WERLANG may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology, Division of Maternal Fetal Medicine, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. SAMAAN WERLANG holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SAMAAN WERLANG no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SAMAAN WERLANG’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SAMAAN WERLANG’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 May, 2021. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on May 16, 2028.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ANA CAROLINA SAMAAN WERLANG may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology, Division of Maternal Fetal Medicine, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. SAMAAN WERLANG holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SAMAAN WERLANG no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SAMAAN WERLANG’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SAMAAN WERLANG’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 May, 2021. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on May 16, 2028.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Faculdade de Medicina de Catanduva, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 16 May 2028
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 May 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Apr 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 16 May 2028

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 May 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2017