THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:20:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Edward Medical College, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 94 Fanshawe Park Rd E
London ON N5X 4C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-667-7081
Fax: 519-661-0083
Address: 550 Wellington Rd
Parkwood Institute
London ON N6C 0A7
Phone: 5196466100
Extension: 44010
Fax: 5196854588

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nabeel Medic Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nabeel (CPSO#: 111770 )
Business Address: 94 Fanshawe Park Rd E
London ON N5X 4C5
5196677081

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: King Edward Medical College, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 94 Fanshawe Park Rd E
London ON N5X 4C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-667-7081
Fax: 519-661-0083
Address: 550 Wellington Rd
Parkwood Institute
London ON N6C 0A7
Phone: 5196466100
Extension: 44010
Fax: 5196854588

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nabeel Medic Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nabeel (CPSO#: 111770 )
Business Address: 94 Fanshawe Park Rd E
London ON N5X 4C5
5196677081

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARSHIA NABEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NABEEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARSHIA NABEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NABEEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Edward Medical College, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017