THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:21:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2291 Kipling Ave
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 744 1484
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Pawlina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pawlina (CPSO#: 111799 )
Business Address: 2291 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 4L6
(416) 741-4545

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2291 Kipling Ave
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 744 1484
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Pawlina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pawlina (CPSO#: 111799 )
Business Address: 2291 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 4L6
(416) 741-4545

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA SOPHIE PAWLINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAWLINA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA SOPHIE PAWLINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAWLINA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 May 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 May 2017