THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:31:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 312-1600 Steeles Ave W
Concord ON L4K 4M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473136116
Fax: 6473133001
Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: 6474767017

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Liam Finlay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Finlay (CPSO#: 111824 )
Business Address: 1600 Steeles Avenue West
Unit 312
Vaughan Ontario L4K 4M2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 312-1600 Steeles Ave W
Concord ON L4K 4M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473136116
Fax: 6473133001
Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: 6474767017

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Liam Finlay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Finlay (CPSO#: 111824 )
Business Address: 1600 Steeles Avenue West
Unit 312
Vaughan Ontario L4K 4M2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIAM COLE FINLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINLAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIAM COLE FINLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINLAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017