THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:36:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-281-7442.
Fax: (647) 480-6289

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. P BASKARAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Baskaran (CPSO#: 111827 )
Business Address: 26 Osler St
Toronto ON M6P 4A2
Business Address: 31A Westbourne Ave
Scarborough ON M1L 2Y1
647-2065143

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-281-7442.
Fax: (647) 480-6289

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. P BASKARAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Baskaran (CPSO#: 111827 )
Business Address: 26 Osler St
Toronto ON M6P 4A2
Business Address: 31A Westbourne Ave
Scarborough ON M1L 2Y1
647-2065143

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRASHANTHI BASKARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASKARAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRASHANTHI BASKARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASKARAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017