THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:18:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Atlas Medical Clinic
unit 1A, 1383 16th Ave
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 918-3560
Fax: 905-669-8646

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BAHAR KHOJASTEH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Khojasteh (CPSO#: 111840 )
Business Address: 1383 16th Avenue
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 1J3
(905) 918-3560

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Atlas Medical Clinic
unit 1A, 1383 16th Ave
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 918-3560
Fax: 905-669-8646

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BAHAR KHOJASTEH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Khojasteh (CPSO#: 111840 )
Business Address: 1383 16th Avenue
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 1J3
(905) 918-3560

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BAHAR KHOJASTEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOJASTEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BAHAR KHOJASTEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOJASTEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017