THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:06:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Extension: 4960
Fax: 905-845-6419
Address: 217 Main St E
Milton ON L9T 1N9
Phone: 9056934240
Extension: 4990
Fax: 9056930596
Address: 102-1540 Cornwall Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 7W5
Phone: (888) 388-7226
Fax: (905) 514-4000

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aurelia Iuliana Andreiev Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Andreiev (CPSO#: 111846 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
905-845-2571

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Extension: 4960
Fax: 905-845-6419
Address: 217 Main St E
Milton ON L9T 1N9
Phone: 9056934240
Extension: 4990
Fax: 9056930596
Address: 102-1540 Cornwall Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 7W5
Phone: (888) 388-7226
Fax: (905) 514-4000

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aurelia Iuliana Andreiev Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Andreiev (CPSO#: 111846 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
905-845-2571

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AURELIA IULIANA ANDREIEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDREIEV is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AURELIA IULIANA ANDREIEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDREIEV is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017