THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:34:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 683 2320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christine Priscilla Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Edwards (CPSO#: 111849 )
Business Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
9056832320

Corporation Name: Dr. Christine Priscilla Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Apr 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 683 2320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christine Priscilla Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Edwards (CPSO#: 111849 )
Business Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
9056832320

Corporation Name: Dr. Christine Priscilla Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Apr 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE PRISCILLA EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE PRISCILLA EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017