THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:17:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. A.D. Dostaler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dostaler (CPSO#: 111853 )
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3

Corporation Name: Dr. A.D. Dostaler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. A.D. Dostaler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dostaler (CPSO#: 111853 )
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3

Corporation Name: Dr. A.D. Dostaler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRE DAVID DOSTALER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOSTALER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRE DAVID DOSTALER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOSTALER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2017