THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:13:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 129 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6476733816
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: 6476733816
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - Utah

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fady Hannah-Shmouni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hannah-Shmouni (CPSO#: 111859 )
Business Address: Dundas Neyagawa Medical Centre and Pharmacy
479 Dundas Street West
Oakville Ontario L6M 1L9
(905) 257-5779
Business Address: 129 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 1H8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 129 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6476733816
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: 6476733816
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - Utah

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fady Hannah-Shmouni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hannah-Shmouni (CPSO#: 111859 )
Business Address: Dundas Neyagawa Medical Centre and Pharmacy
479 Dundas Street West
Oakville Ontario L6M 1L9
(905) 257-5779
Business Address: 129 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 1H8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FADY ALLA HANNAH-SHMOUNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNAH-SHMOUNI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FADY ALLA HANNAH-SHMOUNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNAH-SHMOUNI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017