THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:52:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 722 Arlington Park Pl
Kingston Cardiology Associates
Kingston ON K7M 8H9
Phone: 6133847889
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 460 Princess St
Kingston Heart Clinic
Kingston ON K7L 1C2
Phone: 6135443242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 Jul 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 27 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Hanson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hanson (CPSO#: 111874 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 722 Arlington Park Pl
Kingston Cardiology Associates
Kingston ON K7M 8H9
Phone: 6133847889
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 460 Princess St
Kingston Heart Clinic
Kingston ON K7L 1C2
Phone: 6135443242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 Jul 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 27 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Hanson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hanson (CPSO#: 111874 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW GRANT HANSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW GRANT HANSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017