THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:13:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Morden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Morden (CPSO#: 111885 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Morden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Morden (CPSO#: 111885 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN MORDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORDEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN MORDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORDEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Apr 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017