THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:24:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Old South Maternity Care
Suite 208
190 Wortley Road
London Ontario N6C 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-438-5101
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wei and Bachmeier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bachmeier (CPSO#: 111887 ) Dr. J. Wei (CPSO#: 111976 )
Business Address: 89 Norman St
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
519-464-4400
Business Address: 208-190 Wortley Rd
London ON N6C 4Y7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Old South Maternity Care
Suite 208
190 Wortley Road
London Ontario N6C 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-438-5101
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wei and Bachmeier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bachmeier (CPSO#: 111887 ) Dr. J. Wei (CPSO#: 111976 )
Business Address: 89 Norman St
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
519-464-4400
Business Address: 208-190 Wortley Rd
London ON N6C 4Y7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY CLAIRE BACHMEIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACHMEIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY CLAIRE BACHMEIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACHMEIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017