THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:31:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Central Lambton Family Health Team
Department of Family Medicine
Unit 3
4130 Glenview Road
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 882-2500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander C. Leonard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Leonard (CPSO#: 111906 )
Business Address: Central Lambton Family Health Team
Department of Family Medicine
4130 Glenview Road
Unit 3
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-2500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Central Lambton Family Health Team
Department of Family Medicine
Unit 3
4130 Glenview Road
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 882-2500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander C. Leonard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Leonard (CPSO#: 111906 )
Business Address: Central Lambton Family Health Team
Department of Family Medicine
4130 Glenview Road
Unit 3
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-2500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER CHARLES LEONARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER CHARLES LEONARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017