THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:35:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cobourg Clinic
44 University Avenue East
Cobourg Ontario K9A 1C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-372-3323
Fax: 905-372-3692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. C. Lizotte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Carnevale Lizotte (CPSO#: 111912 )
Business Address: 44 University Ave E 9053733323

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cobourg Clinic
44 University Avenue East
Cobourg Ontario K9A 1C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-372-3323
Fax: 905-372-3692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. C. Lizotte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Carnevale Lizotte (CPSO#: 111912 )
Business Address: 44 University Ave E 9053733323

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASMYNE CARNEVALE LIZOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARNEVALE LIZOTTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASMYNE CARNEVALE LIZOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARNEVALE LIZOTTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017