THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Catharine Street
Unit 201
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 478 5221
Fax: (905) 834 9067
Address: 307 Ridgeway Rd North
Ridgeway Ontario L0S 1N0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Fraelic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fraelic (CPSO#: 111914 )
Business Address: 200 Catharine St
Unit 201
Port Colborne ON L3K 4K8
289- 478-5221

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Catharine Street
Unit 201
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 478 5221
Fax: (905) 834 9067
Address: 307 Ridgeway Rd North
Ridgeway Ontario L0S 1N0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Fraelic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fraelic (CPSO#: 111914 )
Business Address: 200 Catharine St
Unit 201
Port Colborne ON L3K 4K8
289- 478-5221

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH MICHAEL FRAELIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRAELIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH MICHAEL FRAELIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRAELIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Feb 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017