THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:00:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster's Children's Hospital
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omar Aziz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aziz (CPSO#: 111916 )
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2A5
905-521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster's Children's Hospital
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omar Aziz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aziz (CPSO#: 111916 )
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2A5
905-521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD OMAR AZIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD OMAR AZIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017