THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:34:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 770 South Wenige Drive
London Ontario N5X0H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 679 1717
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brett Hill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hill (CPSO#: 111920 )
Business Address: 268 Maiden Lane
St Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
(519) 284-3450
Business Address: 1-770 South Wenige Dr
London ON N5X 0H7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 770 South Wenige Drive
London Ontario N5X0H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 679 1717
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brett Hill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hill (CPSO#: 111920 )
Business Address: 268 Maiden Lane
St Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
(519) 284-3450
Business Address: 1-770 South Wenige Dr
London ON N5X 0H7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRETT ROBERT HILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRETT ROBERT HILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017