THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:13:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: James Potter Road Medical Center
Unit 102 9715 James Potter Road
Brampton Ontario L6X 3B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 457-5800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: 9058134421
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3885 Duke of York Blvd
Mississauga ON L5B 0E4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1739 Bathurst Street
Whole Heart Mental Health
Toronto Ontario M5P 3K5
Phone: (647) 345-0661
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 22 Jul 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 22 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mahgul Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Malik (CPSO#: 111927 )
Business Address: James Porter Road Medical Centre
9715 James Potter Road, Unit 102
Brampton Ontario L6X 3B9
(905) 457-5800
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Pyschiatry
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 831-4421

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: James Potter Road Medical Center
Unit 102 9715 James Potter Road
Brampton Ontario L6X 3B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 457-5800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: 9058134421
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3885 Duke of York Blvd
Mississauga ON L5B 0E4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1739 Bathurst Street
Whole Heart Mental Health
Toronto Ontario M5P 3K5
Phone: (647) 345-0661
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 22 Jul 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 22 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mahgul Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Malik (CPSO#: 111927 )
Business Address: James Porter Road Medical Centre
9715 James Potter Road, Unit 102
Brampton Ontario L6X 3B9
(905) 457-5800
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Pyschiatry
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 831-4421

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHGUL MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHGUL MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017