THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:30:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 312-2863 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-9055
Fax: (416) 281-9006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tom Ziming Lu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lu (CPSO#: 111938 )
Business Address: 312-2863 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 5E9
4162819055

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 312-2863 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-9055
Fax: (416) 281-9006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tom Ziming Lu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lu (CPSO#: 111938 )
Business Address: 312-2863 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 5E9
4162819055

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TOM ZIMING LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TOM ZIMING LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017