THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:10:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgian Bay General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1112 St Andrews Dr
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055261300
Fax: 705-526-4491

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Englehart and District Hospital
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.A. Mastropaolo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mastropaolo (CPSO#: 111950 )
Business Address: 1112 Saint Andrews Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4L9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgian Bay General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1112 St Andrews Dr
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055261300
Fax: 705-526-4491

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Englehart and District Hospital
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.A. Mastropaolo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mastropaolo (CPSO#: 111950 )
Business Address: 1112 Saint Andrews Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4L9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUCAS ALEXANDER MASTROPAOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASTROPAOLO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUCAS ALEXANDER MASTROPAOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASTROPAOLO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017