THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:32:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dhaka, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1825 Provincial Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 5V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199972408
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 29 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bangladesh

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SHEIKH HASIB RAHMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rahman (CPSO#: 111959 )
Business Address: 2-1825 Provincial Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 5V7
5199972408

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dhaka, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1825 Provincial Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 5V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199972408
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 29 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bangladesh

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SHEIKH HASIB RAHMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rahman (CPSO#: 111959 )
Business Address: 2-1825 Provincial Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 5V7
5199972408

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEIKH HASIBUR RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEIKH HASIBUR RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dhaka, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017