THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:34:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main Street West
McMaster University Medical Centre
2F - Obstetrics and Gynaecology
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 73238
Fax: 905-577-8377

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 09 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandeep Singh Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sandhu (CPSO#: 111962 )
Business Address: 1280 Main Street West
2F
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
Business Address: 1280 Main Street West
2F
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main Street West
McMaster University Medical Centre
2F - Obstetrics and Gynaecology
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 73238
Fax: 905-577-8377

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 09 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandeep Singh Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sandhu (CPSO#: 111962 )
Business Address: 1280 Main Street West
2F
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
Business Address: 1280 Main Street West
2F
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDEEP SINGH SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDEEP SINGH SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017