THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:01:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 765 Ward Street
Bridgenorth Ontario K0L 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 292-5590
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tory Cuppy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cuppy (CPSO#: 111969 )
Business Address: 765 Ward Street
Bridgenorth Ontario K0L 1H0
705-292-5590

Corporation Name: Dr. Tory Cuppy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 765 Ward Street
Bridgenorth Ontario K0L 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 292-5590
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tory Cuppy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cuppy (CPSO#: 111969 )
Business Address: 765 Ward Street
Bridgenorth Ontario K0L 1H0
705-292-5590

Corporation Name: Dr. Tory Cuppy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TORY MARY ELIZABETH CUPPY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUPPY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TORY MARY ELIZABETH CUPPY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUPPY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017