THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:30:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Mosul, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Building C- Unit # 1
604 Santa Maria Blvd
Milton Ontario L9L9L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058780055
Fax: 9058788553
Address: Unit 103
400 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T0H7
Phone: 9058763843
Fax: 9058762486

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rafal Altalib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Altalib (CPSO#: 111972 )
Business Address: 400 Bronte Street South
Suite 103
Milton Ontario L9T 0H7
(905) 876-3843
Business Address: 604 Santa Maria Boulevard
Suite C1
Milton Ontario L9T 9L7
(905) 878-0055

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Mosul, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Building C- Unit # 1
604 Santa Maria Blvd
Milton Ontario L9L9L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058780055
Fax: 9058788553
Address: Unit 103
400 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T0H7
Phone: 9058763843
Fax: 9058762486

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rafal Altalib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Altalib (CPSO#: 111972 )
Business Address: 400 Bronte Street South
Suite 103
Milton Ontario L9T 0H7
(905) 876-3843
Business Address: 604 Santa Maria Boulevard
Suite C1
Milton Ontario L9T 9L7
(905) 878-0055

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAFAL ANAAM YAHYA ALTALIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALTALIB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAFAL ANAAM YAHYA ALTALIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALTALIB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Mosul, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017