THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:27:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin Street
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Division of Cardiology
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136967054
Fax: 6136967139

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MK RASHID MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rashid (CPSO#: 111979 )
Business Address: 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin Street
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Division of Cardiology
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136967054
Fax: 6136967139

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MK RASHID MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rashid (CPSO#: 111979 )
Business Address: 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED RASHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASHID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED RASHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASHID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017