THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:12:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1967 Riverside Dr
The Ottawa Hospital
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1967 Riverside Dr
The Ottawa Hospital
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET ARIANA M NOEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET ARIANA M NOEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017