THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:44:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health
Department of Critical Care
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Lakeridge Health - Ajax
Department of Critical Care
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: 905 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 47 Liberty St S
Lakeridge Health - Bowmanville
Department of Critical Care
Bowmanville ON L1C 2N4
Phone: 905 623-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Network – General Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network – Centenary Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough Health Network - Birchmount Hospital
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LAITH ISHAQ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ishaq (CPSO#: 111989 )
Business Address: 200-10 George St
Hamilton ON L8P 1C8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health
Department of Critical Care
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Lakeridge Health - Ajax
Department of Critical Care
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: 905 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 47 Liberty St S
Lakeridge Health - Bowmanville
Department of Critical Care
Bowmanville ON L1C 2N4
Phone: 905 623-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Network – General Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network – Centenary Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough Health Network - Birchmount Hospital
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LAITH ISHAQ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ishaq (CPSO#: 111989 )
Business Address: 200-10 George St
Hamilton ON L8P 1C8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAITH ISHAQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISHAQ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAITH ISHAQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISHAQ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017