THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:28:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: Cole, Kelsi (Used Until: 23 Jan 2020)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 15196212330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 22 Moore St
Lion's Head Hospital
Peninsula Family Health Team
Lion's Head Ontario N0H 1W0
Phone: (519) 793-3445
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 630 Dublin St
Louise Marshall Hospital
Mount Forest ON N0G 2L3
Phone: 519-323-3741
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care
LOCATION: Mount Forest

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelsi E. Cole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cole (CPSO#: 112016 )
Business Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2

General Information

Former Name: Cole, Kelsi (Used Until: 23 Jan 2020)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 15196212330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 22 Moore St
Lion's Head Hospital
Peninsula Family Health Team
Lion's Head Ontario N0H 1W0
Phone: (519) 793-3445
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 630 Dublin St
Louise Marshall Hospital
Mount Forest ON N0G 2L3
Phone: 519-323-3741
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care
LOCATION: Mount Forest

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelsi E. Cole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cole (CPSO#: 112016 )
Business Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELSI ELIZABETH COLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELSI ELIZABETH COLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017