THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:10:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Streetsville Medical
5425 Creditview Rd Unit 8
Mississauga, ON
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-826-1164
Fax: 905-826-1214
Address: 385 Fairway Rd S
Kitchener Ontario N2C2N9
Phone: 519-748-2327
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N4
Phone: 519-745-2273
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ammar Bookwala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bookwala (CPSO#: 112026 )
Business Address: 385 Fairway Rd. S.
Kitchener Ontario N2C 2N9
(519) 748-2327
Business Address: Unit B - 5425 Creditview Rd.
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
(905) 826-1164
Business Address: 751 Victoria St. S.
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N4
(519) 745-2273
Business Address: Summerville FMTU
Trillium Health Partners
700 - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario M5G 1V7
(905) 272-9900

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Streetsville Medical
5425 Creditview Rd Unit 8
Mississauga, ON
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-826-1164
Fax: 905-826-1214
Address: 385 Fairway Rd S
Kitchener Ontario N2C2N9
Phone: 519-748-2327
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N4
Phone: 519-745-2273
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ammar Bookwala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bookwala (CPSO#: 112026 )
Business Address: 385 Fairway Rd. S.
Kitchener Ontario N2C 2N9
(519) 748-2327
Business Address: Unit B - 5425 Creditview Rd.
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
(905) 826-1164
Business Address: 751 Victoria St. S.
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N4
(519) 745-2273
Business Address: Summerville FMTU
Trillium Health Partners
700 - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario M5G 1V7
(905) 272-9900

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMMAR BOOKWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOKWALA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMMAR BOOKWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOKWALA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017