THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:10:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clinique de Medecine Familiale
d'Embrun
869 rue Notre-Dame
Embrun Ontario K0A1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-443-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Lachance Médecine Société Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pleau-Lachance (CPSO#: 112038 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clinique de Medecine Familiale
d'Embrun
869 rue Notre-Dame
Embrun Ontario K0A1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-443-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Lachance Médecine Société Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pleau-Lachance (CPSO#: 112038 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC-ANTOINE PLEAU-LACHANCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLEAU-LACHANCE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC-ANTOINE PLEAU-LACHANCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLEAU-LACHANCE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017