THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:03:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Shirley and Jim Fielding Northeast Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
4th Floor
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-522-6237
Fax: 705-523-7356

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 08 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Guy Desmarais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Desmarais (CPSO#: 112042 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Department of Oncology
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
705-523-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Shirley and Jim Fielding Northeast Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
4th Floor
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-522-6237
Fax: 705-523-7356

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 08 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Guy Desmarais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Desmarais (CPSO#: 112042 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Department of Oncology
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
705-523-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUY ALBERT DESMARAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESMARAIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUY ALBERT DESMARAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESMARAIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017