THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:26:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19 Hospital Drive
PO Box 664
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 658-4544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Loranger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Loranger (CPSO#: 112051 )
Business Address: Weeneebayko General Hospital
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
(705) 658-4544

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19 Hospital Drive
PO Box 664
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 658-4544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Loranger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Loranger (CPSO#: 112051 )
Business Address: Weeneebayko General Hospital
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
(705) 658-4544

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW WAYNE LORANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORANGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW WAYNE LORANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORANGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017