THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:24:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vivo Family Medicine
952 Kingston Road, Unit #102
Toronto Ontario M4E 1S7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-345-8486
Fax: 647-689-6182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Durgaa Rajendran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rajendran (CPSO#: 112067 )
Business Address: 102-952 Kingston Rd
Toronto ON M4E 1S7
6473458486

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vivo Family Medicine
952 Kingston Road, Unit #102
Toronto Ontario M4E 1S7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-345-8486
Fax: 647-689-6182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Durgaa Rajendran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rajendran (CPSO#: 112067 )
Business Address: 102-952 Kingston Rd
Toronto ON M4E 1S7
6473458486

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DURGAA RAJENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJENDRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DURGAA RAJENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJENDRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017