THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:08:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 781 Richmond St
Suite 202
London ON N6A 3H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 663-3081
Fax: (226) 330-0209

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Namita Kanwar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kanwar (CPSO#: 112076 )
Business Address: 781 Richmond St
Suite 202
London ON N6A 3H4
2266633081

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 781 Richmond St
Suite 202
London ON N6A 3H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 663-3081
Fax: (226) 330-0209

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Namita Kanwar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kanwar (CPSO#: 112076 )
Business Address: 781 Richmond St
Suite 202
London ON N6A 3H4
2266633081

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAMITA KANWAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANWAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAMITA KANWAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANWAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017