THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:21:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 ROSSLAND RD E
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052397663
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jul 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 16 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jenova Reginold Constantine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Reginold Constantine (CPSO#: 112099 )
Business Address: 1-122 Cornell Park Ave
Markham ON L6B 1B6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 ROSSLAND RD E
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052397663
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jul 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 16 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jenova Reginold Constantine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Reginold Constantine (CPSO#: 112099 )
Business Address: 1-122 Cornell Park Ave
Markham ON L6B 1B6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENOVA REGINOLD CONSTANTINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REGINOLD CONSTANTINE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENOVA REGINOLD CONSTANTINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REGINOLD CONSTANTINE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017