THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:22:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: Ernst, Hannah Marjory Jean (Used Until: 02 Feb 2022) Ernst, Hannah (Used Until: 31 Jan 2022)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200-645 Finkle St
Woodstock ON N4V 0E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 539 2034
Fax: 519 539 7700
Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 07 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hannah Kuurstra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kuurstra (CPSO#: 112110 )
Business Address: 26 Parkview Dr
Dorchester ON N0L 1G2

General Information

Former Name: Ernst, Hannah Marjory Jean (Used Until: 02 Feb 2022) Ernst, Hannah (Used Until: 31 Jan 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200-645 Finkle St
Woodstock ON N4V 0E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 539 2034
Fax: 519 539 7700
Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 07 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hannah Kuurstra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kuurstra (CPSO#: 112110 )
Business Address: 26 Parkview Dr
Dorchester ON N0L 1G2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANNAH MARJORY JEAN KUURSTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUURSTRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANNAH MARJORY JEAN KUURSTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUURSTRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017