THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:58:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Murray St
4th floor
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-5133
Fax: 416-586-4804
Address: 119 Isabella St
3rd floor
Toronto ON M4Y 1P2
Phone: 416-317-5138
Fax: 4169298849

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Casey House Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Casey House
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. TREVOR MOREY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Morey (CPSO#: 112143 )
Business Address: 200-59 Adelaide St E
Toronto ON M5C 1K6
Business Address: 60 Murray St
4th Floor
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Address: 119 Isabella St
Toronto ON M4Y 1P2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Murray St
4th floor
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-5133
Fax: 416-586-4804
Address: 119 Isabella St
3rd floor
Toronto ON M4Y 1P2
Phone: 416-317-5138
Fax: 4169298849

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Casey House Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Casey House
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. TREVOR MOREY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Morey (CPSO#: 112143 )
Business Address: 200-59 Adelaide St E
Toronto ON M5C 1K6
Business Address: 60 Murray St
4th Floor
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Address: 119 Isabella St
Toronto ON M4Y 1P2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TREVOR STACEY MOREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOREY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TREVOR STACEY MOREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOREY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Apr 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017