THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:08:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ANDREW SHANMUGARAJAH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shanmugarajah (CPSO#: 112149 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2K 1E1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ANDREW SHANMUGARAJAH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shanmugarajah (CPSO#: 112149 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2K 1E1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW ABISHEK SHANMUGARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANMUGARAJAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW ABISHEK SHANMUGARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANMUGARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017