THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:19:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tuscany Medical Centre
Buiding A, Suite 105
9100 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 760-1140
Fax: (905) 760-5587

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alessia Dolcetti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dolcetti (CPSO#: 112156 )
Business Address: 105-9100 Jane St
Building A
Concord ON L4K 0A4
905-760-1140

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tuscany Medical Centre
Buiding A, Suite 105
9100 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 760-1140
Fax: (905) 760-5587

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alessia Dolcetti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dolcetti (CPSO#: 112156 )
Business Address: 105-9100 Jane St
Building A
Concord ON L4K 0A4
905-760-1140

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALESSIA DOLCETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOLCETTI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALESSIA DOLCETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOLCETTI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017