THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:42:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-830-5800
Extension: 6596
Fax: 905-952-2818

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 08 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AERA JUNG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jung (CPSO#: 112159 )
Business Address:
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-830-5800
Extension: 6596
Fax: 905-952-2818

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 08 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AERA JUNG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jung (CPSO#: 112159 )
Business Address:
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AERA YOOKYUNG JUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AERA YOOKYUNG JUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 May 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017