THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:11:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Road
LHSC - University Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
B6-116
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-663-3415
Fax: 519-663-3343

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: THIN XUAN VO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Vo (CPSO#: 112177 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6G 2M3
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Road
LHSC - University Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
B6-116
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-663-3415
Fax: 519-663-3343

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: THIN XUAN VO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Vo (CPSO#: 112177 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6G 2M3
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THIN XUAN VO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THIN XUAN VO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017