THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:35:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-632-3730
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Grubb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grubb (CPSO#: 112211 )
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-632-3730
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Grubb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grubb (CPSO#: 112211 )
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA MONICA MARGARET GRUBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRUBB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA MONICA MARGARET GRUBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRUBB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017