THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:07:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194260130
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jan 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meirui Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Li (CPSO#: 112236 )
Business Address: 365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Business Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194260130
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jan 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meirui Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Li (CPSO#: 112236 )
Business Address: 365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Business Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEIRUI LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEIRUI LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017