THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:28:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 690 Dorval Dr
Suite 700
Oakville ON L6K 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-842-3366
Extension: 4
Fax: 905-842-1180
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Hospital
Department of Medicine, Division of Respirology
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 26 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Youssef (CPSO#: 112239 )
Business Address: 690 Dorval Dr
Suite 700
Oakville ON L6K 3W7
905-842-3366 Extn: 4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 690 Dorval Dr
Suite 700
Oakville ON L6K 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-842-3366
Extension: 4
Fax: 905-842-1180
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Hospital
Department of Medicine, Division of Respirology
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 26 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Youssef (CPSO#: 112239 )
Business Address: 690 Dorval Dr
Suite 700
Oakville ON L6K 3W7
905-842-3366 Extn: 4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID TAMER ADEL AMIN YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID TAMER ADEL AMIN YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Nov 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017