THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:39:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 180 Vine St S
Suite 306
St. Catharines ON L2R 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-228-0402
Fax: 905-662-3304
Address: 1882 Niagara Stone Road
Simpson's Pharmasave
Niagara-on-the-Lake Ontario L0S 1J0
Phone: 9054682121
Fax: 9054682681
Address: 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Phone: 289-837-0304
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 17 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: FALANA AZIZA SHERIFF MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sheriff (CPSO#: 112251 )
Business Address: 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Address: 180 Vine Street South
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 7P3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 180 Vine St S
Suite 306
St. Catharines ON L2R 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-228-0402
Fax: 905-662-3304
Address: 1882 Niagara Stone Road
Simpson's Pharmasave
Niagara-on-the-Lake Ontario L0S 1J0
Phone: 9054682121
Fax: 9054682681
Address: 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Phone: 289-837-0304
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 17 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: FALANA AZIZA SHERIFF MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sheriff (CPSO#: 112251 )
Business Address: 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Address: 180 Vine Street South
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 7P3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FALANA AZIZA SHERIFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERIFF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FALANA AZIZA SHERIFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERIFF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017