THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:32:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 272-8210
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 98 Shipley St
Clinton Public Hospital
Clinton ON N0M 1L0
Phone: (519) 482-3440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 378 Huron Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T5
Phone: 5195134020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 267 Queen St W
St Mary's Memorial Hospital
Toronto ON N4X 1C4
Phone: (519) 284-1332
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Stone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Stone (CPSO#: 112265 )
Business Address: 378 Huron Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T5
Business Address: 98 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
Business Address: 267 Queen Street West
Saint Marys Ontario N4X 1C4
Business Address: 46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 272-8210
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 98 Shipley St
Clinton Public Hospital
Clinton ON N0M 1L0
Phone: (519) 482-3440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 378 Huron Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T5
Phone: 5195134020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 267 Queen St W
St Mary's Memorial Hospital
Toronto ON N4X 1C4
Phone: (519) 284-1332
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Stone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Stone (CPSO#: 112265 )
Business Address: 378 Huron Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T5
Business Address: 98 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
Business Address: 267 Queen Street West
Saint Marys Ontario N4X 1C4
Business Address: 46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017