THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:14:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 51 Benton St
Kitchener ON N2G 3H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2264760459
Fax: 2262153193

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tasha Stoltz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Stoltz (CPSO#: 112266 )
Business Address: 51 Benton St
Kitchener ON N2G 3H1
2264760459

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 51 Benton St
Kitchener ON N2G 3H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2264760459
Fax: 2262153193

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tasha Stoltz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Stoltz (CPSO#: 112266 )
Business Address: 51 Benton St
Kitchener ON N2G 3H1
2264760459

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TASHA ISNINTA STOLTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOLTZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TASHA ISNINTA STOLTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOLTZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017