THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:34:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Infectious Diseases
Suite 4-179
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-5568
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 10 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHARLIE TAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tan (CPSO#: 112285 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Suite 4-179
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
4168645568

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Infectious Diseases
Suite 4-179
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-5568
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 10 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHARLIE TAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tan (CPSO#: 112285 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Suite 4-179
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
4168645568

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLIE YOUYE TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLIE YOUYE TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017